Accounts and annual returns FAMILIES FORWARD

Charity number: 1139557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 April 2019 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 April 2019 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 March 2019 415 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 March 2019 415 days late Download Open in new window