Financial history FAMILIES FORWARD

Charity number: 1139557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £157.82k £153.10k £151.21k £142.07k £99.36k
Total expenditure £164.24k £157.37k £135.15k £145.36k £110.61k
Income from government contracts £54.87k £48.53k £60.20k £41.57k £77.51k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £21.67k