THE PHILADELPHIA NETWORK LIMITED

Charity number: 1134973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 15 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 14 September 2016 On time Download