Financial history THE PHILADELPHIA NETWORK LIMITED

Charity number: 1134973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.20m £1.13m £1.11m £946.41k £1.24m
Total expenditure £1.31m £1.19m £1.15m £973.47k £886.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £3.27k £71.42k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.05m £897.08k £903.25k £734.44k £1.11m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £21.52k £79.17k £80.68k £78.23k £115.48k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £137.48k £151.93k £126.38k £133.74k £16.82k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £63.64k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.31m £1.19m £1.15m £973.47k £886.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.02k £4.16k £5.28k £3.30k £6.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £84.42k £0 £0 £82.74k £53.59k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0