Trustees THE PHILADELPHIA NETWORK LIMITED

Charity number: 1134973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Michael Rutter Trustee 05 April 2020
None on record
Samuel Evans Trustee 05 April 2020
None on record
Timothy John Douglas Armstrong Trustee 05 November 2019
None on record
Neill Andrew Birchenall Trustee 29 January 2019
SHEFFIELD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Giles Augustine Holloway Trustee 06 November 2018
None on record
BRIAN GOOCH Trustee 27 September 2016
None on record
Rachel Marshall Trustee 27 September 2016
None on record
DR A ADEBAJO Trustee
REDS IN THE COMMUNITY
Received: 42 days late