MID CHESHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 September 2020 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 September 2020 72 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 16 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 23 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 27 June 2017 On time Download