MID CHESHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

59 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sylvia Newman Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
slyvia richardson Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
Mike Wells Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Gary Cliffe Trustee 01 September 2012 None on record
Robert Woodcock Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
JOHN JEREMY COLLIER FREEMAN Trustee 01 September 2013
WEAVERHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Overdue by 423 days
THE CHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
WEAVERHAM AND ACTON BRIDGE TRUST Received: On time
THE ECUMENICAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY, WEAVERHAM Received: On time
OPEN SYNOD GROUP Received: On time
john lomas Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
Avril Bastin Trustee 19 June 2018 None on record
christine sara kirkham Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
helen pauline williams Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
Rachel Gilbert-Bratt Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Margaret Done Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
susan jane treeton Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
Olwen Dutton Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
David Martin Whitfield Trustee 01 September 1998
THE ECUMENICAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY, WEAVERHAM Received: On time
CHRIS PRITCHARD Trustee 07 September 2012 None on record
April Wilkinson Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
kay lewis Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
KATHRYN PATRICIA CRAIG Trustee 09 April 2012 None on record
Joyce Wood Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Maureen Ashton Trustee 01 September 2010 None on record
janet susan wardle Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
PETER JOHN CRAVEN Trustee 01 September 2013
NORTHWICH AND DISTRICT HERITAGE SOCIETY Received: On time
Pauline Walker Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Gillian Holden Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
MARGARET MARY SOUTAR Trustee 01 September 2013
NORLEY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time
olwyn whittaker Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
ian trevor jones Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
Michael Arthur Fellows Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Tim Simms Trustee 01 September 2016
THE METHODIST CHURCH - CHESTER AND STOKE-ON-TRENT DISTRICT Received: On time
katherine mary tunnicliffe Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
James Patron Bell Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
lynne cieka Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
MERVYN WILKINSON BOUGHEY Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
David Newman Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Rosemary Gilbert Trustee 31 August 2016 None on record
Cathy Walmsley Trustee 01 September 2016
ANDERTON MEMORIAL HALL Received: On time
Mike Hornby Trustee 19 June 2018 None on record
pauline hesketh robbins Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
roger trevor jones Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
Ellenor Mabel Wilkinson Trustee 07 March 2017 None on record
michael wesley newman Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
PAUL BAILEY Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
DEACON RACHEL MARGARET THOMAS-PRASAD Trustee 09 April 2012 None on record
terence stanley hinton Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
Nick Hearnshaw Trustee 01 November 2015 None on record
rosemary head Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
IDA EYRES Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
JANE MARGARET GLEAVE Trustee 01 September 2013
WHITLEY VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
TREVOR CHARLES STOTT Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
JOHN HULME Trustee 01 September 2015
LION SALT WORKS TRUST Received: On time
ROY ALEC CRAIG Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
Carr Wendy Trustee 01 September 2010 None on record
David Frith Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
margaret mary gill Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
LINDA RUTH REEVE Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
irene may collie Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
Susan Benyon Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
REV PAT BILLSBORROW Trustee 09 April 2012
THE METHODIST CHURCH - CHESTER AND STOKE-ON-TRENT DISTRICT Received: On time