THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN NUNTHORPE

Charity number: 1134124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 10 May 2017 On time Download