CHADIAN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1135688
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £695 £570 £1.20k £1.00k £1.50k
Total expenditure £570 £500 £1.13k £890 £1.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A