THE SERENITAS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are working to raise awareness and participation in Traumatic Incident Reduction(TIR).We want to form partnerships with organizations whose clients or members may benefit from TIR sessions. We offer training courses that can lead to certification from the TIR association and are also committed to the long-term investment in rigorous scientific study of the effects of TIR.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 02 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN STROUD | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7 | £7 | £0 | £64 | £61 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 June 2024 | 221 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 DECEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 8 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 20 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM POST TRAUMATIC SYMPTOMS, OR SIMILAR MENTAL ILLNESS, BY: - THE PROVISION OF AND TRAINING IN TRAUMATIC INCIDENT REDUCTION (TIR), A METHOD FOR THE RESOLUTION OF TRAUMA AND ITS RELATED CONDITIONS; AND - UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO TIR AND ITS RELATED HEALTH BENEFITS, AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SAID RESEARCH TO THE WIDER PUBLIC. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONCEPTS OF STUDENT CENTRED LEARNING AND DEMOCRATIC LEARNING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO THE BENEFITS OF THESE CONCEPTS AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS TO THE WIDER PUBLIC."
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BROAD LANE
HASLINGFIELD
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 1JF
- Phone:
- 01223864800
- Email:
- cstroud@serenitas.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window