HOLD IT DOWN LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training, educational advancement and employment support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Enfield
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 25 March 2010: Standard registration
- 05 April 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HID (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.67k | £85.64k | £94.30k | £74.08k | £65.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.03k | £87.95k | £94.96k | £72.89k | £63.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 27 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 31 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 15 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
15 September 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 03 April 2014 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 04 April 2014 | 63 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 29 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
1 . 1 TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN LONDON BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 1.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED"
Area of benefit
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window