THE OFFICERS' MESS, JOINT SERVICE COMMAND AND STAFF COLLEGE (JSCSC), SHRIVENHAM

Charity number: 1133522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £174.69k £214.42k £140.45k £189.53k £86.92k
Total expenditure £196.51k £217.90k £190.15k £221.95k £125.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A