Trustees UKGBC
Charity number: 1135153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Gratiaen Partridge | Chair | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sam Ewuosho | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Ellis | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Robinson | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Pearce | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tara Ima-Obong Gbolade | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Basil James Demeroutis | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Everett | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Jane Walker | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jerome Anthony Frost | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUNAND PRASAD | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Quinlan | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.