Financial history THE METHODIST CHURCH - LIVERPOOL (SOUTH) CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1134958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £481.51k £417.64k £713.94k £352.34k £187.76k
Total expenditure £367.54k £450.91k £321.82k £325.47k £363.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £1.88k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £245.75k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £6.39k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £459.91k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £321.82k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £16.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A