UNITED REFORMED CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1133373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Baird Trustee 16 September 2014 None on record
Rev CLARE DOWNING Trustee 15 September 2020
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (WESSEX) TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Dr Ian Bishop Harrison Trustee 18 October 2013
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (SOUTH WESTERN SYNOD) INCORPORATED Received: On time
Val Morrison Chair 24 September 2014
DONCASTER STREET PASTORS Received: On time
Revd Dr John Paul Bradbury Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
Rev Nicholas Mark Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
Peter Pay Trustee 16 September 2014 None on record
Andrew Weston Trustee 05 December 2017 None on record
Rev Dr Michael Hopkins Trustee 02 December 2014
ROTARY CLUB OF FARNHAM WEYSIDE TRUST FUND Received: On time
DR DANIEL WILLIAMS (COMMONLY KNOWN AS DR WILLIAMS'S TRUST) Received: On time
THE HANTS-SURREY BORDER METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN SURREY Received: On time
FARNHAM UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY Received: On time
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH HISTORY SOCIETY Received: On time
DAVID LATHBURY Trustee 21 September 2018
WARWICK ROAD UNITED REFORMED CHURCH-TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH Received: On time
IAN HARDIE Trustee 12 September 2017
BRITISH SCHOOL TRUST Received: On time
THE HARVEY AND ISAAC CHARITY Received: On time
Clifford Neil Patten Trustee 18 September 2018
CHARITY OF WILLIAM JOHN COOK Received: On time
CONGREGATIONAL TRUST PROPERTY AND BURIAL GROUND KNOWN AS COCK CLARKS Received: On time
Catriona Wheeler Trustee 13 September 2016 None on record
MARGARET THOMPSON Trustee 24 September 2014
THE CONGREGATIONAL MEMORIAL HALL TRUST Received: On time
Rev James Breslin Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
David Greatorex Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record