HTA SHEBA FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1135473
Charity reporting is overdue by 244 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Annual return 31 May 2019 23 March 2021 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 09 May 2019 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 06 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 20 July 2017 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required