THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EPSOM

Charity number: 1134149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 18 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 18 September 2016 On time Download