THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EPSOM

Charity number: 1134149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £533.79k £283.65k £732.93k £292.44k £295.03k
Total expenditure £295.60k £360.71k £318.60k £281.08k £345.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £370.17k N/A £568.18k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £6.72k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £138.01k N/A £140.12k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £17.92k N/A £23.71k N/A N/A
Income - Other £971 N/A £922 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £251.94k N/A £446.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £292.60k N/A £318.60k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k N/A £3.15k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £15.78k N/A £15.30k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A