THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EPSOM

Charity number: 1134149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Jeffery Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
JUDITH ANNE MITCHELL Trustee 15 April 2018
SURREY RECORD SOCIETY Received: On time
Sarah Lutton Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
Helen Williams Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
DR HOWARD BLUETT Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
LINDA IRENE BLACKWELL Trustee 05 August 2013 None on record
PHILIP JAMES KEITH Trustee 14 May 2018 None on record
Dr JOHN FRANCIS FLOWER Trustee None on record
Rev David James Candlin Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
RICHARD CHRISTOPHER DEAVIN Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
Margaret Angus Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
DAVID CHARLES EGGETT Trustee 10 April 2016 None on record
Mary Gilbert Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
MARTYN JAY HOLLOWAY-NEVILLE Trustee 15 April 2018
2ND EWELL (RAINSTER) SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
Margaret TOPLEY Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
LAURENCE JOHN IMPEY Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
REVD NICHOLAS ANTHONY PARISH Trustee 26 November 2014 None on record
JOHN ANTHONY ROLL PICKERING Trustee
SURREY CHURCHES PRESERVATION TRUST Received: On time