THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - LIGHT HOUSE ASSEMBLY HACKNEY

Charity number: 1137005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 November 2019 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 November 2019 12 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 19 July 2016 On time Download