THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - LIGHT HOUSE ASSEMBLY HACKNEY

Charity number: 1137005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £67.42k £67.69k £55.66k £65.25k £75.83k
Total expenditure £87.56k £63.77k £61.84k £70.36k £70.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A