Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DUKINFIELD ST JOHN

Charity number: 1134598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window