Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S KNIGHTSBRIDGE
Charity number: 1134857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Canon Alan Gordon Gyle | Chair |
|
||||||
Rev Rosemary Jane Richardson | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sarah Raynor | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Huw Walker | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Humphrey Richard Percy | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Alexander Furnival | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Dopheide | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Anna Keighley | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Justin Tull | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roland Brunner | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lawson Crawford | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Louisa Dickerson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Vosper | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev GILLIAN STRAINE | Trustee | 15 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Jean Woolley | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Jamie De Freitas | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claudio Cornini | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hobson Barnes | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Kemmis Betty | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brandon Meredith Powell | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David James Hayton | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LORNA JEAN GRADDEN | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher William Barrow Stephens | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GARDENIA SYLVIA GRIFFITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.