KIRKBY LONSDALE ARTS SCENE

Charity number: 1137253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required