BRITISH BANGLADESH HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1135882
Charity reporting is overdue by 666 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £2.85k £3.30k £972 £100 £0
Total expenditure £2.70k £3.07k £0 £300 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A