Financial history LEA MARSTON WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 500775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £219 £217 £215 £222 £8.82k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £500 £600 £610
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A