Financial history PENZANCE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1134242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £68.12k £92.91k £65.99k £62.60k £63.46k
Total expenditure £60.92k £108.25k £82.70k £66.68k £58.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A