Financial history TREE AID

Charity number: 1135156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.91m £3.33m £5.71m £5.48m £7.03m
Total expenditure £2.74m £3.67m £5.21m £5.24m £6.97m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.95k £78.01k £231.39k £371.44k £183.28k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.84m £3.29m £5.70m £5.45m £7.02m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £21.40k £993 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £45.70k £38.31k £10.22k £12.69k £5.09k
Income - Other £6.55k £474 £365 £12.91k £8.51k
Income - Legacies £39.55k £56.85k £504.93k £115.11k £63.79k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.22m £2.93m £4.51m £4.52m £6.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £523.90k £736.70k £692.50k £727.20k £764.88k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £88.85k £63.56k £70.85k £62.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.33m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0