CARE FOR KIDS NORTH DEVON

Charity number: 1136399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 November 2016 On time Download