CARE FOR KIDS NORTH DEVON

Charity number: 1136399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £47.13k £47.71k £36.50k £50.16k £50.71k
Total expenditure £38.56k £48.19k £50.93k £36.03k £42.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £850 £1.30k £1.43k £1.85k £10.00k