RAWDHAH ACADEMY

Charity number: 1133821
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 August 2021 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 17 August 2021 78 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 August 2020 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 13 September 2019 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 18 June 2018 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 21 September 2017 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required