Accounts and annual returns HOPE STREET TRUST

Charity number: 1140997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required