PETERBOROUGH MUSLIM EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1136767
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £133.57k £170.02k £353.09k £337.76k £374.45k
Total expenditure £166.91k £303.81k £349.62k £357.33k £287.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £9.00k N/A N/A £9.00k