Trustees HACKNEY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1134389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

34 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Paulo Bessa Da Silva Chair 01 September 2020
STOKE NEWINGTON METHODIST CHURCH
Overdue by 21 days
Edris Lucinda Russell Trustee 12 December 2023
None on record
Afua Adofo Trustee 09 October 2022
None on record
Eric Olayinka Ayoola Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
Rita Kusiwaah Dapaah Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Tamba Gborie Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Aminata Gborie Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Kwabena Okyere Darko Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Alexandra Weekes-Aggrey Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Rita Donyina-Ameyaw Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Janette Baxter Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Mandy Noreen Baafi Trustee 02 September 2020
None on record
Mathilda Small-Byam Trustee 04 March 2020
None on record
Gloria Amarteifio Trustee 04 March 2020
None on record
MARY Elvira CAMPBELL Trustee 04 March 2020
STOKE NEWINGTON METHODIST CHURCH
Overdue by 21 days
Alexander Amarteifio Trustee 04 March 2020
None on record
SUSAN Jane MILLMAN Trustee 04 March 2020
EURO-ATAXIA
Overdue by 21 days
Rachael Icilda Lynch Trustee 04 March 2020
None on record
Rev Jongikaya Zihle Trustee 01 September 2019
LONDON DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS
Received: On time
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
WESLEY'S CHAPEL AND LEYSIAN MISSION
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ESSEX AND EAST LONDON
Received: 85 days late
LONDON CHURCH LEADERS
Received: On time
Y CARE INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
EUNICE Cordelia WHYTE Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Lucinda Ansah Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Kwaku Oppong Anyemedu Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Catherine HOGAN Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Joyce Ampofo Borley Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Charlotte MORGAN Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Ernell Diana WATSON Trustee 01 September 2012
None on record
LAURA DYER Trustee 01 September 2012
STOKE NEWINGTON METHODIST CHURCH
Overdue by 21 days
Clord Dyer Trustee 01 September 2012
STOKE NEWINGTON METHODIST CHURCH
Overdue by 21 days
Ebun Esther Abebi ADEKUNLE Trustee 01 September 2012
STOKE NEWINGTON METHODIST CHURCH
Overdue by 21 days
VALENTINE BAXTER Trustee 25 July 2012
None on record
CORA WOOLCOCK Trustee 25 July 2012
None on record
RUDOLPH HOMER Trustee 25 July 2012
None on record
MACKENZIE Carty Macdonald GREER Trustee
None on record
Rev JOHN PAMHARE SAKUTOMBO Trustee
None on record