BRERETON PARISH COMMUNITY INTEREST GROUP

Charity number: 1135754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.41k £602 £2.50k £2.21k £1.97k
Total expenditure £1.47k £1.63k £2.47k £1.89k £2.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A