Trustees BOSTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

31 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JULIE DODDRELL Chair
None on record
John Trevor Hewitt Trustee 16 March 2022
None on record
Yvonne Dow Trustee 22 March 2021
None on record
CAROL LIDGETT Trustee 18 November 2020
SIR THOMAS MIDDLECOTTS EXHIBITION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Heather Darley Trustee 16 October 2019
None on record
Peter Criddle Trustee 14 October 2019
None on record
Rev Ann Louise Lett Trustee 01 September 2019
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Rev David John Curran Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Gail Cooper Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Jean Denise Burgess Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Joanna Margaret Criddle Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Robert Haresign Trustee 28 March 2019
None on record
Rev Dr Valerie Jean Ogden Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Angela Crunkhorn Trustee 16 March 2017
None on record
Rev Maurice Perry Trustee 19 September 2016
None on record
Rev Marie Greenwood Trustee 16 September 2016
None on record
Dorothy Barnden Trustee 09 September 2015
None on record
STEPHEN COCK Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Emma Garnham Trustee 13 March 2014
None on record
JENNY BOATWRIGHT Trustee 17 October 2012
None on record
LYNN THORN Trustee 03 January 2012
BOSTON ONE STOP SHOP
Received: On time
SHEILA LYMER Trustee
SCOPE FOR BOSTON AND DISTRICT
Received: On time
GEOFFREY MALCOLM CARTER Trustee
None on record
ANN FARMER Trustee
None on record
AUDREY MAUD BURRELL Trustee
None on record
MR STUART BIRKETT Trustee
None on record
MR MICHAEL JESSOP Trustee
None on record
JENNIFER JESSOP Trustee
None on record
Geoffrey Sharp Trustee
None on record
JEAN JENNIFER DIXON Trustee
None on record
AUDREY ELIZABETH FORINTON Trustee
None on record