Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, GRANGE PARK

Charity number: 1135369
Charity reporting is up to date (128 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 March 2022 128 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 February 2021 95 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window