Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, GRANGE PARK

Charity number: 1135369
Charity reporting is up to date (128 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £104.65k £81.55k £107.34k £111.01k £85.20k
Total expenditure £121.44k £119.53k £111.32k £121.08k £59.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A