STAINES AND FELTHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 September 2020 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 September 2020 77 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 December 2019 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 26 December 2019 179 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 June 2017 On time Download