STAINES AND FELTHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

25 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANE LECKIE Trustee None on record
ANNE HEBENTON Trustee
EGHAM-BY-RUNNYMEDE HISTORICAL SOCIETY Received: On time
CAROL MCKENNER Trustee None on record
RITA BERRY Trustee None on record
Rev ANDREW REED Trustee 01 September 2015
THE METHODIST CHURCH: SOUTH-EAST DISTRICT Received: On time
ST JUDE'S UNITED CHURCH, ENGLEFIELD GREEN Received: On time
Rev Judith Allford Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
Rev Alan Wickens Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record
ARTHUR JOHN BENNETT Trustee 03 April 2011 None on record
MR CHRIS MORTON Trustee None on record
JUSTIN CAMIS Trustee None on record
VERNA DOE Trustee None on record
SHEILA HASSAN Trustee
FAITH AWARENESS IN CHILDREN TRUST Received: On time
Jill Britton Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Pauline Shilston Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
ROBINA MARY HOWLISTON Trustee None on record
PAUL MURPHY BSC Trustee None on record
Roz Sendorek Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
GEOFF NICHOLSON BSC Trustee None on record
MRS MAGGIE NETTO Trustee None on record
VALERIE BARBET Trustee None on record
MARGARET ASH DIP ED. Trustee None on record
GRAHAM OLIVER WELLS Trustee None on record
JONATHAN MARK GRIFFITHS Trustee None on record
Marylin Woodley Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
ROGER H GRIFFITHS Trustee None on record