THE PARENT AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF THE STEINER ACADEMY HEREFORD

Charity number: 1135990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 24 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 24 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 29 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 26 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 26 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 10 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 July 2016 On time Download