A FISH FOR LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help underprivileged, vulnerable children by providing means of safe shelter and education. In 2010 we completed a project in Kenya where we sent a team of skilled tradesmen over to the Fururah Orphanage to build them a new Girls Dormitory, the Charity funded this entire project and is still funding eduction to some of the children at the Orphanage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 January 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Northumberland
- Kenya
Governance
- 12 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNE ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/01/2020 | 04/01/2021 | 04/01/2022 | 04/01/2023 | 04/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.83k | £1.41k | £3.30k | £3.68k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.03k | £3.36k | £3.59k | £3.77k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 January 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 January 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 January 2020 | 16 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING GRANTS OR SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS OR ORGANISATIONS THAT AID PARTICULAR GROUPS OF POOR PEOPLE. B) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ORPHANED CHILDREN BY BUILDING OR HELPING TO BUILD AND MAINTAIN ORPHANAGE CENTRES AROUND THE WORLD. C) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE JAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WILDWOOD
BURGHAM PARK
LONGHORSLEY
MORPETH
NORTHUMBERLAND
NE65 9QY
- Phone:
- 01665600997
- Email:
- JO.ROBINSON@STONEHOMES.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window