THE NATIONAL RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1134859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simone Webb Trustee 16 June 2020 None on record
Eleanor Potter Trustee 16 June 2020 None on record
Simon Collins Chair 02 June 2016 None on record
Richard Flowerdew Trustee 16 June 2020
INTERLINK RCT Received: On time
Lindsey Cook Trustee 16 June 2020 None on record
Gordon Taylor Trustee 02 February 2016 None on record
James Jordan Trustee 22 June 2021 None on record
Richard Alistair Boucher Trustee 07 June 2016 None on record