THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST PETER, BURY ST EDMUNDS

Charity number: 1134666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £714.43k £375.40k £441.25k £371.80k £293.76k
Total expenditure £412.61k £335.61k £364.11k £420.37k £350.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £26.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £633.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £49.35k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £17.85k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £13.67k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £360.27k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £412.18k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £426 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £200 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £26.80k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A