BRISCA F2 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As our charity is to aid motor racing drivers who have been injured through a racing incident, we fund raise up and down the UK to raise funds to help the said drivers to enable them to have some financial support when out of work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 27 August 2010: Standard registration
- BSCDA F2 BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HARLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CARLTON ELLIOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON BLOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.61k | £10.31k | £17.61k | £11.72k | £8.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.26k | £11.60k | £16.02k | £11.57k | £10.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/02/2010 AS AMENDED ON 10/08/2010 AS AMENDED ON 16/07/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST MOTOR RACING DRIVERS WHO HAVE BEEN INJURED WHILST PARTICIPATING IN STOCK CAR RACING IN THE UK AND ARE UNABLE TO WORK AS A RESULT OF THOSE INJURIES AND THE FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS OF SUCH DRIVERS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 OAK CLOSE
CASTLE GRESLEY
SWADLINCOTE
DE11 9RU
- Phone:
- 07759719813
- Email:
- treasurer@f2benfund.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window