OM GROUP

Charity number: 1137356
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £10.69k £9.79k £9.99k £6.31k £12.08k
Total expenditure £11.57k £7.05k £9.65k £7.93k £11.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £1.00k