Trustees WELLS HARBOUR MARITIME TRUST
Charity number: 1136392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Adrian Dwyer | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liam Pink | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jones | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
sally Wynne | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Cooper | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Groom | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Denys John Hickey | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ellis | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Melvyn Raymond Catton | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.