Trustees WOODVILLE BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1134695

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Joshua Pramod Parmar | Chair | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Francis Garner | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Siu On Jonathan Fok | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JUSTIN CHALONER | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CHARLES PEARCE | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNABEL BARBARA CHALONER | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS JUDY DAVIES | Trustee | 26 September 2006 |
|
|
||||
STUART NEIL HARDISTY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.