Accounts and annual returns BARTON ON SEA METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1135451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 22 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 12 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 07 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 14 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window