Financial history BARTON ON SEA METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1135451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £132.35k £114.07k £72.17k £90.68k £86.46k
Total expenditure £124.85k £124.11k £77.70k £108.89k £91.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A